RI S0597 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Police body cameras required. Restricts use of force. Mandates various police reporting.
Title
Law Enforcement Integrity Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] |
Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2021) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0597.pdf |