RI S0597 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the definition of firearms to include taser. Permits any person over the age of eighteen (18) to possess a stun gun. Enacts the review and appeal process of applying for a license to carry with the licensing authority or attorney general.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0597.pdf |