RI S0594 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gives RIHMFC authority to bring foreclosure petitions after one year from sale of property for taxes if it is foreclosed, not owner occupied or abandoned; changes members of advisory board; exempts RIHMFC owned property from non-utilization tax.
Title
Tax Sales
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0594.pdf |