RI S0590 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires an owner or developer of a project valued at or above $5,000,000 or more to attest by sworn affidavit that the properties have no outstanding liens and to file a surety bond conditioned upon payment for labor and materials of the project.
Title
Surety Bond Required For Tax Credits
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0590.pdf |