RI S0582 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes pharmacies to dispense prescriptions of less than a thirty (30) day supply for the purpose of synchronizing a patient's medications.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0582.pdf |