RI S0576 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-22 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-22 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Broadens the immunity from prosecution for drug offenses afforded under the Good Samaritan Overdose Prevention Act to a person who in good faith seeks medical assistance for a person experiencing a drug overdose.
Title
The Good Samaritan Overdose Prevention Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/21/2015) |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2015) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2015) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |