RI S0572 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates the development of a transition plan by the DCYF and DBHDDH for all children under the jurisdiction of the family court who are developmentally delayed or seriously emotionally disturbed prior to the child turning age 21.
Title
Proceedings In Family Court
Sponsors
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] |
Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2015-06-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2015) |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/28/2015) |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2015) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |