RI S0568 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Cannabis Control Commission to regulate all aspects of cannabis production and distribution.
Title
Cannabis Authorization, Regulation And Taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2021) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2021) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |