RI S0567 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from the sales and use taxes tangible personal property donated for a charitable purpose to nonprofit organization deemed tax-exempt by both the federal government, this state or any state government of the United States of America.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes - Computation And Liability
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0567.pdf |