RI S0567 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-09 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-09 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the unauthorized and intentional access of another's computer with the intent to view confidential information. Violators would be guilty of a felony and subject to imprisonment for up to 5 years and a fine of not more than $5,000.
Title
Computer Crime
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Senate - Computer crime approval of amendment lc 001056/2 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/09/2015) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2015) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |