RI S0563 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows a pound or animal shelter to put an animal up for adoption after ten (10) days if it has a tag or after five (5) days if it has no tag.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cruelty To Animals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Passage in concurrence as amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseSigned by Governor
2017-09-25HouseTransmitted to Governor
2017-09-19SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2017-09-19SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017)
2017-09-19HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended
2017-09-15HousePlaced on House Calendar (09/19/2017)
2017-06-30HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/30/2017)
2017-06-29HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A as amended
2017-06-29HouseScheduled for consideration (06/29/2017)
2017-06-27HouseMeeting postponed (06/27/2017)
2017-06-27HouseScheduled for consideration
2017-05-04HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2017-05-03SenateSenate read and passed
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/03/2017)
2017-04-26SenateCommittee recommends passage
2017-04-21SenateScheduled for consideration (04/26/2017)
2017-04-12SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-04-07SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2017)
2017-03-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback