RI S0559 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Proclaiming March 4, 2021, To Be "national Hospitalist Day" In The State Of Rhode Island
Title
Senate Resolution Proclaiming March 4, 2021, To Be "national Hospitalist Day" In The State Of Rhode Island
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/09/2021) |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0559.pdf |