RI S0555 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Transfers the tax exemption classification to a surviving spouse until remarriage or death.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Subject To Taxation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-12 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-14SenateSigned by Governor
2023-06-12SenateTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-12HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2023-06-10HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/12/2023)
2023-06-06SenateSenate read and passed
2023-05-30SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/06/2023)
2023-05-30SenateCommittee recommends passage
2023-05-26SenateScheduled for consideration (05/30/2023)
2023-03-21SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-17SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2023)
2023-03-14SenateMeeting postponed (03/14/2023)
2023-03-10SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback