RI S0553 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds pickles and relish to those foods which are permitted to be manufactured and sold as a farm home food product.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sanitation In Food Establishments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019)
2019-03-14SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback