RI S0552 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the current law that allows farmers to sell produce directly to consumers by directing the department of health to permit home food manufacture and sales direct to consumers.
Title
Food And Drugs -- Sanitation In Food Establishments -- Home Food Manufacture Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2021) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0552.pdf |