RI S0551 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands use of public utilities reserve fund to state court appeals to and regulatory matters before federal agencies and increase amount chargeable to public utility to $750,000 but not more than $250,000 for administrator’s representation of state.
Title
Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2017) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2017) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |