RI S0546 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits an employer from permanently replacing an employee who has participated or honored a union authorized strike.
Title
Permanent Replacement Employees
Sponsors
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] |
Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2021) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0546.pdf |