RI S0545 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the law which provides enhanced penalties of a fine of not more than $250/ imprisonment for not more than 6 months for disclosure of health care information with respect to an individual diagnosis and treatment of a sexually transmitted disease.
Title
Sexually Transmitted Diseases
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Sexually transmitted diseases (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Sexually transmitted diseases (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-14 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-07 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2017) |
2017-05-31 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2017) |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2017) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |