RI S0543 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-18 - Senate voted to recommit to Senate Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-18 - Senate voted to recommit to Senate Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Rhode Island Turnpike and Bridge Authority to include language establishing the rights of the holders with any agreement it makes with the holders of bonds or notes issued by it.
Title
Rhode Island Turnpike And Bridge Authority Bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Senate | Senate voted to recommit to Senate Finance |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2015) |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/09/2015) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2015) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |