RI S0542 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that for parole violations that don't involve a new criminal offense, the right to a final parole revocation hearing not involving new criminal offenses may be waived if the violator admits to the violation and accepts the sanctions imposed.
Title
Correctional Institutions -- Parole
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2021) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0542.pdf |