RI S0539 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Human Services - Support Of Homeless: would establish a permanent council known as the "Interagency Council on Homelessness" to study and apply solutions for ending homelessness in the state
Title
An Act Relating To Human Services - Support Of Homeless
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Frank Devall [D] | Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] | Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
Sen. John Tassoni [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-30 | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-29 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-29 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-29 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to House Municipal Government | |
2011-04-14 | Senate passed Sub A as amended | |
2011-04-12 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-31 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-03-31 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0539.pdf |