RI S0538 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds the class of combination vehicles to the list of vehicles eligible for New England Patriots Charitable Foundation registration plates.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2017) |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/17/2017) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/10/2017) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2017) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |