RI S0537 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes that manufacturers of devices capable of connecting to the Internet equip the devices with reasonable security features.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions - Internet Privacy And Security
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Sen. Mark McKenney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0537.pdf |