RI S0518 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Delineates the definitions of felony, misdemeanor and petty misdemeanor.
Title
General Provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/04/2021) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/29/2021) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2021) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |