RI S0516 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes very comprehensive changes to the election laws concerning voter registration, voter rights, mail ballots and early day voting.
Title
Relating To Elections
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2021) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0516.pdf |