RI S0515 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $100,000 To The Public Utilities Commission (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $100,000 To The Public Utilities Commission For The Purposes Of Hiring Additional Expert Capacity To Manage The Process And Ultimately Develop A Microgrid Services Tariff.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $100,000 To The Public Utilities Commission (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $100,000 To The Public Utilities Commission For The Purposes Of Hiring Additional Expert Capacity To Manage The Process And Ultimately Develop A Microgrid Services Tariff.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-11SenateCommittee heard
2023-05-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/11/2023)
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback