RI S0515 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Names the roundabout at the intersection of Division Road and New England Tech Boulevard in East Greenwich the "Michael B. Isaacs Roundabout".
Title
Permanent Joint Committee On Naming All New Buildings, Bridges, Edifices And Other State Constructions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-26 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2017) |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2017) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |