RI S0510 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gradually increases the hourly minimum wage from $9.60 to $15.00 on January 1, 2022, as well as gradually increasing the hourly minimum wage for employees receiving gratuities from $3.89 an hour to $15.00 an hour on January 1, 2026.
Title
Wages
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0510.pdf |