RI S0510 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the state's prohibition on adults using, possessing, and cultivating marijuana for personal use and establishes a system of regulated marijuana retail distribution to adults 21 and older & imposes taxes at both the wholesale and retail level.
Title
Taxation And Regulation Of Marijuana
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/02/2015) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0510.pdf |