RI S0508 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows an individual to lawfully possess a device that would silence the sound of a natural report of a rifle or shotgun to hunt game, as long as the host rifle or shotgun is allowed.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] | Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2021) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0508.pdf |