RI S0503 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the "department of energy transformation planning" chapter within the division of public utilities to implement long-term distribution system planning.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department Of Energy Transformation Planning

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-17SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2023)
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback