RI S0495 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Special Legislation
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to House Special Legislation
Pending: House Special Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds the administrator of the supreme court as an individual authorized to perform marriages and would clarify that the current administrators of the superior court, family court, district court, or traffic tribunal are empowered to perform marriages.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House Special Legislation |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |