RI S0492 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the income eligibility limit for medical assistance coverage for seniors and disabled individuals from one hundred percent (100%) to one hundred thirty-three percent (133%) of federal poverty level.
Title
Health Care For Elderly And Disabled
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2021) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0492.pdf |