RI S0491 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Meeting postponed (03/28/2019)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Meeting postponed (03/28/2019)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the number of days of child support arrearage from 90 days to 60 days for an obligor to be deemed not in compliance with a court order of child support and be subject to license suspension.
Title
Full Enforcement Of Support Obligations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/28/2019) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0491.pdf |