RI S0488 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Require any person voting by mail ballot or emergency mail ballot to provide proof of identity, exempting those in a hospital, hospice, or skilled nursing facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mail Ballots - Conduct Of Election And Voting Equipment And Supplies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-15SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019)
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback