RI S0487 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires pharmacists to notify their customers whether their cost sharing benefits exceed the actual retail price of the prescription sought.
Title
Pharmacies -- Prescriptions
Sponsors
Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2021) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2021) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |