RI S0485 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State Of Rhode Island (four Year Terms And Term Limits For Senators And Representatives) (proposes An Amendment To The Constitution To The Electors Of The State That Increases The Length Of Term For Senators And Representatives To Four (4) Years And Would Impose A Limit Of Four (4) Consecutive Terms For Those Offices.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State Of Rhode Island (four Year Terms And Term Limits For Senators And Representatives) (proposes An Amendment To The Constitution To The Electors Of The State That Increases The Length Of Term For Senators And Representatives To Four (4) Years And Would Impose A Limit Of Four (4) Consecutive Terms For Those Offices.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-15SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019)
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback