RI S0485 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes pharmacies to dispense prescriptions of less than a thirty (30) day supply for purposes of synchronizing a patient's medications.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0485.pdf |