RI S0485 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Governor Convene The Children's Cabinet As Soon As Practicable With The Goal Of Improving Outcomes For Rhode Island Children And Families Served By Multiple State Programs And Departments
Title
Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Governor Convene The Children's Cabinet As Soon As Practicable With The Goal Of Improving Outcomes For Rhode Island Children And Families Served By Multiple State Programs And Departments
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/19/2015) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2015) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |