RI S0483 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the child advocate to review case records of fatalities or near fatalities when there is abuse or neglect present and the family had prior department contacts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Advocate Office

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenateSigned by Governor
2019-06-26SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-20HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2019-06-18HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2019)
2019-06-18HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-06-14HouseScheduled for consideration (06/18/2019)
2019-06-11HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-06-07HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2019)
2019-06-06HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2019-06-05SenateSenate read and passed
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/05/2019)
2019-05-28SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-05-23SenateScheduled for consideration (05/28/2019)
2019-03-12SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-08SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2019)
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback