RI S0480 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Invests the chief justice of the supreme court with the explicit authority to address issues affecting the conduct of judicial business and order whatever response(s) he or she deems necessary.
Title
Relating To Courts And Civil Procedure--courts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |