RI S0478 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Vital Records: would define adoptees in the State of Rhode Island and would provide a procedure for the release to adoptees of their birth certificates in cases where a no release form has not been filed with the division of vital records
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Vital Records
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Frank Devall [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Sen. Rhoda Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-29 | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-27 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-27 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-06-23 | Referred to House H.E.W. | |
2011-06-22 | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2011-06-16 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-15 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-06-15 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0478.pdf |