RI S0475 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enables cities and towns to provide a tax exemption to individuals who take resiliency measures to rehabilitate their property because of flood hazards.
Title
Coastal And Riverine Home Protection
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2021) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0475.pdf |