RI S0472 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - Meeting postponed (06/02/2021)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increases maximum aggregate amount of community remote net-metering systems from 30 MW to 90 MW requires and reallocate 40 MW to low/moderate households on and after 1/2/22 on first come/first serve basis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Net Metering

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02SenateMeeting postponed (06/02/2021)
2021-06-01SenateProposed Substitute
2021-05-28SenateScheduled for consideration
2021-04-07SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-04-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2021)
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback