RI S0471 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-30 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-30 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Respectfully Urging The Department Of Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals And The Executive Office Of Health And Human Services To Increase Certain Direct And Home Care Worker Wages
Title
Joint Resolution Respectfully Urging The Department Of Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals And The Executive Office Of Health And Human Services To Increase Certain Direct And Home Care Worker Wages
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2017) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |