RI S0470 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the exception to the ($100,000.00) limitation of damages when the state is engaged in a proprietary function in the commission of a tort, and would exempt the state and any city or town or fire district from interest awards in civil actions.
Title
Procedure Generally - Governmental Tort Liability
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0470.pdf |