RI S0463 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires courses in family life or sex education be taught in grades 6 -12 and be appropriate for students of all races, genders, sexual orientations, ethnic and cultural backgrounds.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/14/2021) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0463.pdf |