RI S0458 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Defines service contracts and clarifies that consumer service contracts are not insurance and not otherwise subject to the insurance code.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions - Service Contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Service contracts approval of amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Service contracts approval of amendment (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-20 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2019) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |