RI S0455 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes an education savings account program to assist and support the parents, guardians and caretakers of students with the materials, tutors, technology and other educational support for learning at-home or at any other remote-learning site.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-03-26SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2021)
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback