RI S0451 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the issuance of a special license plate for Lupus Foundation New England.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration Of Vehicles--special Plate For Lupus Foundation New England

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/25/2015)
2015-06-24SenateSenate read and passed
2015-06-24SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/24/2015)
2015-06-24SenateCommittee recommends passage
2015-06-22SenateScheduled for consideration (06/24/2015)
2015-04-15SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2015-04-09SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2015)
2015-02-25SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback